Financial history THE LITTLE STAUGHTON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.35k £20.21k £5.84k £7.80k £7.06k
Total expenditure £4.89k £6.96k £10.52k £15.10k £4.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.20k £17.30k N/A N/A N/A