Financial history THE EARLY BIRTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.03k £78.60k £79.40k £77.82k £46.02k
Total expenditure £110.03k £104.59k £61.72k £68.79k £86.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A