CHEDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Use of villagers and others to hire in the parish of Chedington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Mackenzie-Green | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Godley | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Stephenson | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sanderson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Mullins | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sanderson | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Soanes | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Millward | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Micheal Johnson | Trustee | 10 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £10.14k | £14.65k | £1.86k | £8.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £2.26k | £7.36k | £2.30k | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £5.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29TH NOVEMBER 1982. REGISTRATION DATE UNKNOWN FROM FILE RECORDS. DEFAULT DATE 01/01/61 RECORDED AS DATE OF REGISTRATION.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHEDINGTON AND ITS VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHEDINGTON AND ITS VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
CHEDINGTON
BEAMINSTER
DT8 3JA
- Phone:
- 01935891925
- Email:
- chedingtonvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window