Trustees CHEDINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 286744
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Mackenzie-Green | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Godley | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Stephenson | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sanderson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Mullins | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Sanderson | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Soanes | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Millward | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Micheal Johnson | Trustee | 10 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.