THE ST JAMES BIDDENHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Centred around the village church of St James, Biddenham. The Charity has in the past provided funding for the provision of new hymn books, items for use in the eucharist, maintenance of the church bells, organ and decoration of the interior of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
Governance
- 11 May 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR B JOHNSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Maureen Sackett | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR P J SQUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42 | £18 | £8 | £118 | £278 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MAY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES AFFECTING THE PARISH OF ST. JAMES AND TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS AND WORK OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THEREIN INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMIT TO: A) THE AUGMENTATION OF THE ENDOWMENT OF THE CHURCH OF ST. JAMES BIDDENHAM. B) THE REPAIR MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE CHURCH OF ST. JAMES BIDDENHAM, AND THE FURNITURE AND UPKEEP THEREOF. C) PROVISION FOR THE UPKEEP OF THE SERVICES OF THE CHURCH OF ST. JAMES, BIDDENHAM INCLUDING THE EXPENSES OF THE ORGAN AND DECOR THEREOF.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. JAMES BIDDENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 QUEENS CLOSE
BIDDENHAM
BEDFORD
MK40 4AB
- Phone:
- 07966148459
- Email:
- bjandjmj@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window