PADDINGTON FARM TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PADDINGTON FARM TRUST PROVIDES ACCESS TO THE COUNTRYSIDE FOR THE PEOPLE OF WESTMINSTER AND OTHER AREAS OF LONDON. PFT ALSO PROVIDES OUTDOOR, EDUCATIONAL AND HEALTHY-LIVING ACTIVITIES TO BROADEN PEOPLE'S HORIZONS AND BUILD THEIR CONFIDENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 March 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE MARY BUTTIGIEG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carol Archibald | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Joe Kentish | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Perry | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hamza Taouzzale | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ANDREA FARRELL | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Banwell | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE SHAW | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tom Fitch | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRENDA GRAVELLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVER SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.74k | £124.14k | £123.31k | £164.68k | £155.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.31k | £116.31k | £119.46k | £174.53k | £158.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH FEBRUARY 1983 AMENDED 17TH JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 MARCH 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND THE UNITED KINGDOM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, PARTICULARLY FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, HOME-CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE AMONG THE GENERAL POPULATION OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT HUMANITY AND MORALITY. (D) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 A-D OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES)
Area of benefit
LONDON AND THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PADDINGTON TRUST
MAIDENCROFT FARM
WICK
GLASTONBURY
BA6 8JN
- Phone:
- 01458832752
- Email:
- info@paddingtonfarm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window