Accounts and annual returns MEADOW SPORTS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 286824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 27 May 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 27 May 2024 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 16 March 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 16 March 2023 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 26 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 26 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window