Financial history ABLECARE HOMES TRUST

Charity number: 286826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/04/2020 12/04/2021 12/04/2022 12/04/2023 12/04/2024
Total gross income £697 £500 £3.12k £6.42k £1.48k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £4.65k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A