WELLINGTON MAJORETTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Majorette troupe with pom poms, batons and band performing at a variety of events. Members aged from 4 years and over.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 July 1983: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Brierley | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89k | £7.61k | £7.36k | £11.65k | £14.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.98k | £4.71k | £10.06k | £9.51k | £15.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 9TH MARCH 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN TRAINING AND PERFORMING WITH A TROUPE OF MAJORETTES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF WOMEN AND GIRLS IN WELLINGTON IN THE OF LIFE OF WOMEN AND GIRLS IN WELLINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
WELLINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 John Cole Close
WELLINGTON
TA21 8DR
- Phone:
- 01823661532
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window