City of Bath Brass Band

Charity number: 286845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Bath Spa Band aims to promote and develop the highest standard of brass band music for the enjoyment of the public and the satisfaction of its skilled amateur musicians. This is achieved by taking part in contests and the presentation of public concerts. Our training band exists for players of all ages and abilities to gain experience and find their musical feet before joining the band proper.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,248
Total expenditure: £14,221

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BATH SPA BAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony David Furness Williams Trustee 14 February 2022
None on record
Philip Davis Trustee 28 January 2013
None on record
JOHN SIDNEY LIGHT Trustee 25 April 2012
None on record
KENNETH RONALD ASH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.42k £9.38k £8.82k £11.58k £14.25k
Total expenditure £18.05k £9.29k £7.14k £12.63k £14.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 December 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2023 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 February 2022 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
71 Dunch Lane
MELKSHAM
SN12 8DX
Phone:
07580269264