Financial history COWDEN VILLAGE HALL (COMMONLY KNOWN AS COWDEN MEMORIAL HALL)

Charity number: 286856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.23k £3.24k £3.20k £10.00k £8.66k
Total expenditure £7.13k £3.69k £4.80k £8.78k £7.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A