CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION SUPPLYING HOSPITALS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objects of the charity are the provision of medical and remedial equipment for the national health service hospitals in the East Berkshire Health District, which are: St Marks Hospital, Maidenhead-Wexham Park Hospital, Slough-Upton Hospital, Slough-King Edward VII Hospital, Windsor-Heatherwood Hospital, Ascot.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 03 April 1983: Standard registration
- 09 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.49k | £0 | £500 | £500 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.78k | £0 | £0 | £20.00k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 28 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 22 February 2017 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND MARCH 1983
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE HOSPITALS IN EAST BERKSHIRE. (B) THE PROVISION OF REMEDIAL EQUIPMENT FOR NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE HOSPITALS IN EAST BERKSHIRE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 2 AND 3 OF TRUST DEEDE.
Area of benefit
EAST BERKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window