Trustees OLD TOWN YOUTH CLUB
Charity Number: 286889

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW KEITH PATTEN | Chair | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
OILIVA CLARKE | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Delroy Anglin | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Patten | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
RONALD FRANCIS ANTHONY LEOW | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA ANGLIN | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
KAREN BARNES | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CURTIS LAWRENCE | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DAWN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR RAY EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.