Accounts and annual returns THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF BASKETMAKERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286901
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 05 February 2014 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 05 February 2014 5 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 11 April 2013 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 28 May 2013 117 days late
Annual return 05 April 2011 26 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 26 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 26 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 28 February 2011 23 days late