THE ST LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 286918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raises and distributes funds for the relief of leprosy sufferers throughout the world. NOTE: The trustees meet twice a year, in April and October. The vast majority of grants are made at the October meeting. Unless you have received a grant from the Trust previously, ALL applications MUST be submitted on a Pro-Forma available from the Secretary.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £86,396
Total expenditure: £103,618

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1983: Standard registration
  • 03 May 2017: Funds received from 1017486 COMMANDERY OF AVALON OF THE MILITARY AND HOSPITALL...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER CHARLES HIRST Chair 28 October 2022
THAMES CHASE TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy Patrick Abraham Trustee 28 October 2022
THE SOCIETY OF THE FAITH (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE ST JOHN THE DIVINE KENNINGTON PASTORAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE ORDER OF ST BENEDICT AT ALTON ABBEY
Received: On time
ALTON ABBEY CIO
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, CLAPHAM
Recently registered
KESTON COLLEGE
Received: On time
PATRICK WILLIAM THOMAS WILKINS Trustee 28 September 2021
THE KNIGHTS OF THE ROUND TABLE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
THE BAKER'S BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr DAVID KNOX Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Ivar Andreas Robert John Grey Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
John Anthony Reid Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Charles John Paul Betz Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £93.21k £71.97k £112.92k £111.05k £86.40k
Total expenditure £100.76k £103.03k £88.74k £116.05k £103.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 2
The Glove Factory
Montacute Road
Tintinhull
Yeovil
BA22 8SL
Phone:
01935826723
Website:

No information available