1ST STICKER SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Scout Group is based in a local community and usually consists of Squirrel Scouts, Beaver Scouts, Cub Scouts and Scouts. Sticker Scout Group has Beavers, Cubs and Scouts. We provide Skills4Life to over 100 young people every week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 June 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Rickard | Chair | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Ewart Roots | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Wymer | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Povey | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Roots | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ford | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Mills | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Row | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Maughan | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Osborne | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £20.11k | £11.74k | £6.98k | £7.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.74k | £15.53k | £15.51k | £12.29k | £12.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.60k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Sticker Scouts
Scout Hut
St Stephens Road
Sticker
Cornwall
PL26 7ET
- Phone:
- 07725504412
- Email:
- stickerscouts@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window