Financial history JEWISH LADS' AND GIRLS' BRIGADE

Charity number: 286950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.68m £1.01m £1.36m £1.58m £1.96m
Total expenditure £1.83m £1.06m £1.26m £1.58m £1.83m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £330.98k N/A £166.99k £476.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £787.56k £1.05m £1.09m £1.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £599.02k £108.67k £279.44k £488.30k £773.55k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £504 £152 £52 £1.43k £6.01k
Income - Other £0 £114.35k £28.11k £0 £15.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.02m £1.21m £1.51m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.98k £47.23k £51.90k £66.50k £35.76k
Expenditure - Governance £34.21k £27.09k £28.20k £33.19k £44.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0