THE GENERATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical and genetic research for the prevention and treatment of cerebral palsy and other conditions having genetic origins.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 May 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Francis Drobniewski MA FRCPath | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr John Buckle PhD | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Freeman | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Mathew PhD FMedSc | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Curteis | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CAMPBELL ROSS OBE MA MBA | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
IVAN FALLON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR ELLEN SOLOMON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.18k | £15.20k | £19.03k | £20.63k | £22.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.04k | £15.46k | £64 | £596 | £569 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF MEDICAL AND GENETIC RESEARCH AND IN PARTICULAR FOR SEEKING OUT THE CAUSES PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF CEREBRAL PALSY, OTHER NEUROLOGICAL HANDICAPS, MENTAL RETARDATION (SUCH AS MONGOLISM) AND OTHER CONDITIONS HAVING GENETIC ORIGINS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cleavers
Church Road
Mannings Heath
HORSHAM
West Sussex
RH13 6JE
- Phone:
- 02078488108
- Email:
- mmg.admin@kcl.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window