GATEWAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gateway is a local scouting group, serving children in St Ives between the ages of 6 and 14. We aim to help young people enjoy adventurous activities and to give them opportunities for personal development and social responsibility. We offer a wide range of activities from camping, survival, first aid, archery, canoeing, shooting, astronomy and much, much more!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 17 May 1983: Standard registration
- 1ST ST IVES (CAMBRIDGESHIRE) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Hunter | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Jaggs | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Abraham | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42k | £1.89k | £1.83k | £5.58k | £6.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £629 | £3.60k | £1.63k | £2.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Pig Lane
ST. IVES
PE27 5QE
- Phone:
- 01480493561
- Email:
- ann.h.abraham@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window