Financial history HILDA MARY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 287032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.61k £6.88k £6.64k £8.14k £8.40k
Total expenditure £2.62k £0 £1.97k £2.04k £3.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A