Trustees FROGMORE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 287053

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Trumper | Chair | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mawson Greenwood | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Inch | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelley Hewitt Kirklin | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Inch | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Lee Vaughn Kirklin | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juliette Winsome Bird | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Paul Dye | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ELIZABETH DYE | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.