SCHOOL ROAD HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education of persons under the age of 25 who are resident in the Diocese of Gloucestershire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 June 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JACKMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN AYLOTT | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|||||
June Pearce | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Ryan | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Mary Downes Mrs | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Mary Hart Mrs | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev GRAHAM PHILIP BOWKETT | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DILYS JONES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.66k | £7.81k | £7.83k | £8.06k | £8.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.45k | £1.07k | £3.46k | £5.35k | £5.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20TH AUGUST 1872 SCHEME OF 5TH JULY 1983 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 17 OCTOBER 1995, AS AMENDED ON THE 28TH FEBRUARY 2005 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE EITHER (A) RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF CHARLTON KINGS OR (B) ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF CHELTENHAM AND HAVE, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, STRONG LINKS WITH THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY, CHARLTON KINGS, AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE HAVING REGARD TO THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
CHARLTON KINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Parish Centre
New Street
Charlton Kings
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 8JJ
- Phone:
- 07971 675169
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window