THE PERELANDRA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants to assist in the relief of poverty and in connection with religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 May 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CORAL EILEEN FELTHAM | Trustee | 23 December 1982 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ERNEST FELTHAM | Trustee | 23 December 1982 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.72k | £14.40k | £14.61k | £15.45k | £16.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.10k | £14.50k | £15.50k | £14.05k | £15.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD DECEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADMINISTRATION OF ANY PROPERTY OR ESTATE USED OR INTENDED FOR ANY CHARITABLE OBJECT INSTITUTION OR WORK RELIGIOUS OR OTHERWISE. (B) THE SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION LOAN GIFT SUBSCRIPTION OR OTHERWISE OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK WHICH SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:- (I) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION; (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS; (III) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY; (IV) THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED. (C) GENERALLY THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME COMMEND ITSELF TO THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Ashcroft
Shalford
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU4 8JT
- Phone:
- 07804413122
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window