BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 287118
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The BVA AWF is the veterinary profession's own charity which aims to improve the welfare of animals through veterinary science, education and debate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1997: Standard registration
  • 23 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 23 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1192203 BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUN...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £133.03k £133.03k £125.37k £0 £0
Total expenditure £184.28k £184.28k £334.47k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 4 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASE AND WELFARE OF SHEEP, CATTLE AND HORSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 29 July 1997 : Standard registration
  • 23 May 2025 : Removed
  • 23 May 2025 : Asset transfer out