THE UNDERGROUND RAILWAY ROLLING STOCK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
conservation (Preservation of Rolling Stock & other items related to Underground Railways - [mainly London Transport])
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 June 1983: Standard registration
- U R R S T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Wojiech Chmielwski | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Charles ALEXANDER | Trustee | 02 February 1983 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GERALD AMMANN | Trustee | 02 February 1983 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.28k | £12.60k | £21.72k | £4.25k | £11.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236 | £267 | £1.84k | £183 | £731 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE INDUSTRIAL HISTORY OF UNDERGROUND RAILWAYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 IRVINE DRIVE
STOKE MANDEVILLE
AYLESBURY
HP22 5UN
- Phone:
- 01296612783
- Email:
- brianurrst@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window