WHITWELL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall. Available for hire on a session (morning, afternoon and evening) basis, for a variety of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 04 October 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Watts | Chair | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Darren Nice | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Russell | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carole Lacey | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Cooke | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE DAY | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Root | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Halpin | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HATTON | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK J HALPIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE ELIZABETH LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRANT CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.46k | £19.81k | £3.93k | £4.78k | £5.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.01k | £2.53k | £16.43k | £6.23k | £5.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WHITWELL AND NITON IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECRETION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WHITWELL NITON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 PARADISE COTTAGES
SOUTHFORD LANE
WHITWELL
VENTNOR
PO38 2QJ
- Phone:
- 01983 731063
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window