LANDSCAPE RESEARCH GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LRG is concerned with promoting research, ideas and knowledge about all types and aspects of landscape, from wilderness to cities. It has a worldwide membership. It publishes the respected academic journal "Landscape Research", provides grants for research and organises conferences and workshops on varied landscape themes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Australia
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Italy
- Japan
- Lebanon
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Taiwan
- Tunisia
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 24 June 1983: Standard registration
- LANDSCAPE RESEARCH GROUP (Working name)
- LRG (Working name)
- LANDSCAPE RESEARCH GROUP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fei Mo | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kalliopi Pediaditi Prud'homme | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Theano S Terkenli | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mengyixin Li | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jens Ruben HAENDELER | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Barbara BYER | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Merham Mohamed Hosny Anwar KELEG | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian LAWSON | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Laura Alice WATT | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Caleb MELL | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR TIMOTHY LAURENCE WATERMAN | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marouen Hedhli | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HANNES PALANG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.46k | £123.12k | £114.94k | £128.38k | £130.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.00k | £102.38k | £93.22k | £131.19k | £144.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 17 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH, ENCOURAGE INTEREST AND EXCHANGE INFORMATION FR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FIELD OF LANDSCAPE AND ANY RELATED FIELDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O AM WELLS ACCOUNTANCY
GROUND FLOOR
66 HIGH STREET
LEWES
BN7 1XG
- Phone:
- 07917 150469
- Email:
- admin@landscaperesearch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window