STANLEY TECHNICAL HIGH SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 07 June 1983: Standard registration
- 27 January 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 14 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF STANLEY TECHNICAL HIGH SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
STANLEY TECHNICAL HIGH SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window