Financial history FLITWICK AND AMPTHILL UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORP

Charity number: 287167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.86k £38.75k £25.04k £15.41k £18.58k
Total expenditure £32.65k £32.82k £36.86k £20.86k £17.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.45k £12.73k N/A N/A