Accounts and annual returns THE LORD BRAYBROOKE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 287181
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 14 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 04 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required