THE RINGING WORLD LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and foster the art, science and history of bells and bell ringing to bellringers and the general public, and in particular by publishing educational material and historical archives, facilitating communication, encouraging public interest and uniting the ringing community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 June 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Richard David Lay | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jopp | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Crighton | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elva Ruth Ainsworth | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Davies | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Martin Bradshaw | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.06k | £270.30k | £290.88k | £313.65k | £341.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.51k | £299.05k | £303.52k | £284.34k | £314.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12/5/1983 AS AMENDED 3/6/ 2002 AND 31/5/2004. as amended on 07 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
“TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER THE ART, SCIENCE AND HISTORY OF BELLS AND BELL RINGING TO BELLRINGERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR BY PUBLISHING EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL AND HISTORICAL ARCHIVES, FACILITATING COMMUNICATION, ENCOURAGING PUBLIC INTEREST AND UNITING THE RINGING COMMUNITY.”
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ringing World Ltd
Elvin House
35a High Street
ANDOVER
SP10 1LJ
- Phone:
- 01264366620
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window