MIZPAH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees make distributions pro-actively and do not respond to enquiries/requests for funding. The purpose of the Trust is to provide grants to other charities/ voluntary bodies and individuals for general charitable purposes and operating in the following areas; the relief of poverty, overseas aid/ famine relief and the promotion of the Christian religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Bell | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHARLES OSBORNE BELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIA EMILY BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.42k | £124.85k | £186.40k | £22.18k | £23.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.15k | £61.72k | £31.49k | £20.15k | £29.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 23RD MARCH 1983
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORESTERS HOUSE
HUMBLY GROVE
SOUTH WARNBOROUGH
HOOK
RG29 1RY
- Phone:
- 01256862263
- Email:
- Alancobell@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window