CROMHALL PARISH HALL AND RECREATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs the Parish Hall on behalf of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 June 1983: Standard registration
- CROMHALL VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Hayley Carr | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gilbert | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zena Whitefield | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.44k | £4.13k | £12.53k | £5.26k | £8.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £6.72k | £4.39k | £11.10k | £6.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
THE CROMHALL PARISH HALL AND RECREATION TRUST SHALL AIM TO PROVIDE A HALL AND RECREATION FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CROMHALL IN THE COUNTY OF AVON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CROMHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Church Lane
Cromhall
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
GL12 8AL
- Phone:
- 01454294315
- Email:
- jue71@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window