THE SPITALFIELDS CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF MINORITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EUROPE'S FIRST MUSEUM TO EXPLORE ISSUES OF DIVERSITY, IMMIGRATION AND IDENTITY, THIS CHARITY IS CREATING A FINE NEW PURPOSE FOR A RARE HISTORIC BUILDING. A MUSEUM OF IDEAS AND DEBATE, A PLACE OF EDUCATION FOR ALL, 19 PRINCELET STREET TODAY ATTRACTS VISITORS FROM BRITAIN AND ACROSS THE WORLD. THE CHARITY ALSO SUPPORTS DIVERSITY TRAINING, AND PROMOTES UNDERSTANDING ACROSS COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 June 1983: Standard registration
- 16 April 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 April 2024: Funds transferred to 273695 SPITALFIELDS HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
- 19 PRINCELET STREET (Working name)
- MUSEUM OF IMMIGRATION AND DIVERSITY (Working name)
- THE SPITALFIELDS CENTRE (Working name)
- THE SPITALFIELDS CENTRE - 19 PRINCELET STREET (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.35k | £4.48k | £2.26k | £2.40k | £18.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.59k | £4.46k | £20.26k | £20.26k | £15.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 19TH MAY 1983 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 FEB 2022 as amended on 19 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE SPITALFIELDS CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF MINORITIES; AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY (1) THE STUDY OF EFFECTS OF IMMIGRANTS AND IMMIGRATION ON THE SPITALFIELDS AREA OF LONDON AND ON OTHER AREAS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ON THE INHABITANTS OF SUCH AREAS. (2) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM RELATING THERETO INCLUDING THE FORMATION OF A COLLECTION OF ARTEFACTS MADE BY SUCH IMMIGRANTS AND COLLECTION OF PAPERS MANUSCRIPTS AND OTHER DOCUMENTS RELATING THERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window