Trustees THE CENTRE FOR ECONOMIC POLICY RESEARCH
Charity Number: 287287

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF SIR CHARLES RICHARD BEAN | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francis Bloch | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Klaus Regling | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ferdinando Giugliano | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Governor Signe Krogstrup | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivier Garnier | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Pierre Landau | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Woosey | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Patrick Honohan | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Fingleton | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRONWYN NANETTE CURTIS | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Venables | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.