THE SCHOLA GREGORIANA OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study, teaching, promotion and performance of choral and other music, and in particular Gregorian Chant or Plainsong.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN BERKELEY | Chair | 08 December 2013 |
|
|||||
ALASTAIR TOCHER | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan Gardner | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WHITE | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev Julian Michael Burling | Trustee |
|
||||||
BERNARD WALTER MARRIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.23k | £3.58k | £3.34k | £3.34k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.20k | £1.46k | £2.61k | £2.61k | £5.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD MAY 1983 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 7TH OCTOBER 1984 AND 21ST OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
(I) THE STUDY OF, TEACHING OF, THE PROMOTION OF, AND THE PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL AND OTHER MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE MUSIC KNOWN AS GREGORIAN CHANT OR PLAIN SONG EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND OR ELSEWHERE. (II) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES NOT BEING LESS THAN SIX IN NUMBER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 WESTERN PARK ROAD
LEICESTER
LE3 6HQ
- Phone:
- 01162856158
- Email:
- info@scholagregoriana.org
- Website:
-
scholagregoriana.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window