REDRUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hall & meeting rooms for hire for meetings, training (equipment available), functions (licensed bar on premises), workshops and bazaars. The centre is wheelchair friendly with loop systems in the rooms and has a toilet for the disabled, nappy changing facilities and parking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 July 1983: Standard registration
- REDRUTH OPEN ACCESS CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Stephen Barnes Cllr | Chair | 27 September 2006 |
|
|||||
NICK LAKE | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Bob Mansfield | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imelda Martin | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Craze | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Taylor | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.74k | £27.91k | £56.43k | £43.87k | £71.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.08k | £34.05k | £46.81k | £41.83k | £49.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.71k | £24.89k | £3.40k | £4.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD MAY 1983 as amended on 15 Oct 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF REDRUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
REDRUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
REDRUTH COMMUNITY CENTRE
FOUNDRY ROW
CHAPEL STREET
REDRUTH
CORNWALL
TR15 1AW
- Phone:
- 01209215525
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window