THE STUART AND ELLEN LYONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations are given to charitable causes in the fields of health, welfare, education and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART RANDOLPH LYONS CBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adam James Samuel Lyons | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN HARRIET LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ROSE FALK BLOOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.23k | £10.48k | £254.92k | £122.47k | £52.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £935 | £960 | £223.82k | £368.69k | £17.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED THE 27TH APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 SEYMOUR WALK
LONDON
SW10 9NF
- Phone:
- 02073523309
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window