WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST

Charity Number: 287400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds and receive donations to apply to any charitable purpose connected with Winchester Cathedral.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £252,390
Total expenditure: £321,020

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL ATKINSON VLL Chair
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Morrison Hands Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Mark Thistlethwayte Trustee 14 February 2023
None on record
Sir Jonathan Portal Trustee 14 February 2023
HOSPITAL OF ST CROSS AND ALMSHOUSE OF NOBLE POVERTY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST CROSS HOSPITAL WINCHESTER
Received: On time
The Very Reverend Catherine Ogle Trustee 02 June 2017
THE RAYMOND FREKE AWARD FUND
Received: On time
SOUTHERN CATHEDRALS FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Received: 69 days late
THE CARL KLEIN TRUST
Received: On time
HOSPITAL OF ST CROSS AND ALMSHOUSE OF NOBLE POVERTY
Received: On time
ST SWITHUN'S SCHOOL (WINCHESTER)
Received: On time
BRUCE RODNEY WINGATE PARKER MBE Trustee 26 September 2014
FRIENDS OF WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE ELIZABETH COLLEGE UK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FYFIELD OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOHN ROBERT STEEL Trustee 08 November 2012
HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLANDS HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL CAMPBELL MBE DL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.06k £19.11k £10.14k £151.34k £252.39k
Total expenditure £538.78k £23.86k £18.12k £219.00k £321.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 THE CLOSE
WINCHESTER
SO23 9LS
Phone:
01962857220