THE DOVE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASSISTS CHARITIES, CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS, AND APPEALS WITH MANY ASPECTS OF THEIR ORGANISATION, ADMINISTRATION,SERVICE DELIVERY, PROVIDES INFORMATION, ADVICE,HELP, AND GIVING FACILITIES VIA CHARITYGIVING.CO.UK.HELPS GOOD CAUSES ACHIEVE THEIR GOALS, WITH PROMOTION AND FUNDRAISING ONLINE ETC. IT RUNS BRYAN GUNN'S APPEAL, HELPING FAMILIES WITH ISSUES AROUND LEUKAEMIA AND CANCER, AND RESEARCHES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2012
Total income:
£3,274,637
Donations and legacies | £3.20m | |
Charitable activities | £23.31k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £48.44k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,163,356
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£38,062 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.14m | |
Retained for future use | £111.28k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.14m | |
Retained for future use | £149.34k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 1983: Standard registration
- 30 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- BRYAN GUNN'S LEUKAEMIA APPEAL (Working name)
- CHARITYGIVING.CO.UK (Working name)
- THE DOVE TRUST UK CHARITY GIVING (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £692.27k | £896.08k | £1.14m | £1.95m | £3.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £487.44k | £898.32k | £960.85k | £1.89m | £3.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £649.44k | £796.53k | £1.08m | £1.91m | £3.20m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £81.43k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.71k | £0 | £63.46k | £46.46k | £23.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.12k | £18.13k | £830 | £312 | £48.44k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £479.33k | £774.22k | £930.91k | £1.76m | £3.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.00k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £7.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £712.80k | £1.62m | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £71.86k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.09k | £841 | £631 | £474 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £71.98k | £73.39k | £76.36k | £12.41k | £150.03k | |
|
Other assets | £542.24k | £452.87k | £486.16k | £752.39k | £688.48k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £52.77k | £44.24k | £38.55k | £34.90k | £12.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | |||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | |||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | |||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SETTLOR DURING HIS LIFE SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window