RALPH SHACKMAN TRUST
Charity number: 287406
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research in the field of urology. Awarding grants for such research and travel grants to inspect new techniques abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Total income: £5,950
Total expenditure: £3,300
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
One or more trustees receive payments and/or benefits from the charity for being a trustee
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 25 August 1983: Standard registration
- 10 June 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 June 2015: Funds transferred to 1128683 THE UROLOGY FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | £8.51k | £8.16k | £7.68k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.22k | £16.44k | £44.42k | £6.72k | £3.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 14 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 12 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 23 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH MAY 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF UROLOGY IN HUMAN-BEINGS AND OTHER MAMMALS (FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC) AND THE STUDY OF THE PROBLEMS ASSOCIATED WITH ORGAN TRANSPLANTS IN HUMAN BEINGS AND OTHER MAMMALS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.