THE FRENCH BULLDOG WELFARE TRUST

Charity Number: 287420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rescue French bulldogs, give veterinary treatment when necessary. Rehome to caring suitable owners.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,445
Total expenditure: £6,264

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 September 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRENCH BULLDOG WELFARE TRUST (Working name)
  • THE FRENCH BULLDOG CLUB OF ENGLAND WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL GORDON Chair 12 March 2009
None on record
Laura Hamilton Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
Gareth Hickin Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Nathan Waddington Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Irene Stansfield Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.34k £4.09k £3.70k £2.74k £2.44k
Total expenditure £18.71k £3.69k £19.42k £14.71k £6.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Windsor Terrace
Whitley Bay
NE26 2NS
Phone:
01912809177