UPWEY OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the area in and around Upwey, Weymouth without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 10 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREGORY ROCHFORT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adrian John Wood | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denys David Mountjoy | Trustee | 09 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAMES COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM ALBERT CRUMBLEHOLME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diana Coral PATTINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.56k | £25.31k | £14.88k | £16.14k | £16.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.36k | £14.02k | £12.87k | £14.52k | £15.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.26k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN AND AROUND UPWEY, WEYMOUTH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE AREA IN AND AROUND UPWEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Elwell Street
Weymouth
DT3 5QF
- Phone:
- 07407319118
- Email:
- mountjoydave@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window