ECHO (EVELINA CHILDREN'S HEART ORGANISATION)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports children treated at the Evelina Children's Hospital (and clinics visited by Evelina Cardiologists), principally for Congenital Heart Defects, as well as their parents/carers/close family. Provide information, friendship, support when parents feel alone or need advice. Advocacy provides patient voice to help Guys & St Thomas's NHS Trust shape services for CHD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 July 1983: Standard registration
- 09 May 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 May 2012: Funds transferred to 1146494 EVELINA CHILDREN'S HEART ORGANISATION LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 30/11/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.98k | £65.35k | £124.88k | £155.89k | £177.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.57k | £71.88k | £116.55k | £128.45k | £124.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2011 | 03 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 21 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | 08 July 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 27 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | 31 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | 02 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | 17 July 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JUNE 1983 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2002 AND 11TH MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND OTHERS WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT, HANDICAPPED OR DISABLED PRINCIPALLY FROM HEART DISORDERS AND WHO ARE EITHER PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF THE EVELINA CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL WITHIN GUY'S AND ST THOMAS HOSPITAL TRUST, OR WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT AT CLINICS VISITED BY THE TRUSTS PAEDIATRIC CARDIOLOGISTS.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE GUY'S HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window