WHITEFRIARS FIRST AND MIDDLE SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No activities. We work on a donation basis from parents to pay for school trips
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Harrow
Governance
- 21 July 1983: Standard registration
- 17 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.30k | £6.84k | £6.55k | £10.63k | £14.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £6.47k | £6.83k | £10.86k | £14.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 04 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 04 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 28 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 08 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MARCH 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT WHITEFRIARS FIRST AND MIDDLE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT WHITEFRIARS FIRST AND MIDDLE SCHOOL NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window