THE KOSH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We produce live performance events and documentary film productions. We perform in a range of venues from arts centres to schools and festivals. Our film productions are predominantly with marginalised communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 1983: Standard registration
- 24 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- KINETICS OF SOCIAL-HARMONY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.71k | £1.28k | £1.42k | £953 | £176 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £1.92k | £1.72k | £662 | £163 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATON INCORPORATED 14TH JUNE 1983, AS AMENDED 15TH DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF DANCE, BALLETT AND SIMILAR CHOREOGRAPHIC ARTS, AND THE ENCOURAGEMEN OF THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window