THE CHRISTIAN CHILDREN'S FUND OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receive legacies and apply those legacies to charitable activities in accordance with the terms under which they were received.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 July 1983: Standard registration
- CCFGB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Katanu Mwosa | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Amanda Griffith | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH JULY 1983 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 7TH DECEMBER 1988 AND 29 APRIL 1997 & 18TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE CHILD POVERTY AND HARDSHIP ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO PROMOTE THE CARE, DEVELOPMENT OR EDUCATION OF NEEDY CHILDREN, ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RELIGION, SEX OR RACE OR NATIONAL ORIGIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FOR THE HEALTHY GROWTH, DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OTHERWISE LACKING BASIC NECESSITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON THE RIGHTS OF TH CHILD (1959) AND TO PROMOTE AND OBSERVANCE OF THAT CONVENTION AND DECLARATION. (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH RELIEVE OR COMBAT MALNUTRITION, HUNGER, DISEASE, SICKNESS, POVERTY OR DISTRESS ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, (3) AND SUBJECT THERETO TO CARRY ON SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE COMPANY MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Childrens Fund of GB
75 King William Street
LONDON
EC4N 7BE
- Phone:
- 02077492490
- Email:
- info@familyforeverychild.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window