Governing document THE CHRISTIAN CHILDREN'S FUND OF GREAT BRITAIN

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH JULY 1983 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 7TH DECEMBER 1988 AND 29 APRIL 1997 & 18TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE CHILD POVERTY AND HARDSHIP ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO PROMOTE THE CARE, DEVELOPMENT OR EDUCATION OF NEEDY CHILDREN, ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RELIGION, SEX OR RACE OR NATIONAL ORIGIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING FOR THE HEALTHY GROWTH, DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OTHERWISE LACKING BASIC NECESSITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION ON THE RIGHTS OF TH CHILD (1959) AND TO PROMOTE AND OBSERVANCE OF THAT CONVENTION AND DECLARATION. (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH RELIEVE OR COMBAT MALNUTRITION, HUNGER, DISEASE, SICKNESS, POVERTY OR DISTRESS ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, (3) AND SUBJECT THERETO TO CARRY ON SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE COMPANY MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.