Financial history HANHAM TODDLERS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 287553
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £263.87k £330.23k £325.50k £277.65k £296.64k
Total expenditure £265.34k £327.64k £312.05k £256.09k £294.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £197.46k N/A £274.22k £231.88k £250.62k