Financial history THE MORTIMER SOCIETY

Charity number: 287579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £4.10m £3.81m £4.29m £4.75m £5.11m
Total expenditure £3.92m £4.33m £4.40m £4.77m £5.06m
Income from government contracts £4.01m £3.63m £4.18m £4.50m £4.94m
Income from government grants £53.99k £159.90k £66.17k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £75.42k £164.09k £99.27k £230.56k £112.81k
Income - Other trading activities £4.51k £0 £4.82k £2.88k £2.83k
Income - Charitable activities £4.01m £3.63m £4.18m £4.50m £4.94m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.63k £9.94k £9.54k £25.03k £49.77k
Income - Other £0 £1.52k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £164.09k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.92m £4.33m £4.39m £4.75m £5.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £925 £3.38k £5.44k £18.95k £19.09k
Expenditure - Governance £9.11k £0 £9.74k £0 £12.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0